Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/13/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/13/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/14/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/19/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/19/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/19/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/19/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/19/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/19/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 09/19/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/20/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/21/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/21/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/21/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/21/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/27/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/27/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/27/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/27/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/02/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/02/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/02/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/02/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/05/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/05/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/05/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/05/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/06/2000