Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/13/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/20/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/20/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/20/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/20/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/20/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/20/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/26/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/26/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/06/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/06/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/06/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/06/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/06/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/06/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/06/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 12/07/2000