There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Popular Titles

Debt Reduction bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Debt Relief Lock-box Reconciliation Act for Fiscal Year 2001

Short Titles as Reported to House

Debt Relief Lock-box Reconciliation Act for Fiscal Year 2001

Short Titles as Introduced

Debt Relief Lock-box Reconciliation Act for Fiscal Year 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for reconciliation pursuant to sections 103(b)(2) and 213(b)(2)(C) of the concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2001 to reduce the public debt and to decrease the statutory limit on the public debt.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
09/18/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 3 (Roll no. 477).(text: CR H7679-7681)
09/18/2000Committee on The Budget discharged.
09/18/2000Committee on Rules discharged.
09/18/2000Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 106-862, Part I.
09/14/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
09/20/2000SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 815.
09/19/2000SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
09/18/2000-6:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/18/2000-6:29pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 3 (Roll no. 477). (text: CR H7679-7681)
09/18/2000-6:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
09/18/2000-5:02pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/18/2000-4:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5173.
09/18/2000-4:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7679-7687)
09/18/2000-4:11pmHouseMr. Herger moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/18/2000HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 518.
09/18/2000HouseHouse Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 18, 2000.
09/18/2000HouseCommittee on The Budget discharged.
09/18/2000HouseCommittee on Rules discharged.
09/18/2000HouseHouse Committee on The Budget Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 18, 2000.
09/18/2000HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 106-862, Part I.
09/14/2000HouseReferred to House Rules
09/14/2000HouseReferred to House Budget
09/14/2000HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
09/14/2000HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/14/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/14/2000 Referred to
09/18/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-862
House Budget09/14/2000 Referred to
09/18/2000 Discharged from
House Rules09/14/2000 Referred to
09/18/2000 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5173.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5173. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/18/2000)

Debt Relief Lock-box Reconciliation Act for Fiscal Year 2001 - Title I: Debt Reduction Lock-Box - Amends Federal public finance provisions to establish the Public Debt Reduction Payment Account in the Treasury. Requires the Secretary of the Treasury to use amounts in the Account to pay at maturity, or redeem or buy before maturity, any Government obligation held by the public and included in the public debt. Provides that any obligation which is paid, redeemed, or bought with amounts from the Account shall be canceled and retired and prohibits its reissuance.

Appropriates funds for the Account. Prohibits such appropriation from being considered as direct spending for purposes of pay-as-you-go provisions of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act).

(Sec. 102) Reduces the public debt limit by the amount appropriated into the Account.

(Sec. 103) Bars Account receipts and disbursements from being counted as new budget authority, outlays, receipts, or deficit or surplus for purposes of : (1) the Federal Government budget as submitted by the President; (2) the congressional budget; or (3) the Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act.

(Sec. 105) Requires the Secretary to report to specified congressional committees on the Account.

Title II: Social Security and Medicare Lock-Box - Amends H. Con. Res. 290 (106th Congress) to replace a point of order in the House of Representatives or the Senate against consideration of any revision of such resolution or any concurrent budget resolution for FY 2002 that sets forth a deficit for any fiscal year with one that provides a point of order against consideration of any budget resolution that sets forth a surplus for any fiscal year that is less than the surplus of the Federal Hospital Insurance Trust Fund for such year. Makes such point of order inapplicable to the extent that a violation would result from an assumption in the legislation of an increase in outlays or decrease in revenue relative to the baseline underlying the resolution for social security or Medicare reform legislation for any fiscal year. Requires the resolution, if in violation due to such assumption, to include a statement identifying any increase in outlays or decrease in revenue.

Makes it out of order in the House or the Senate to consider any bill, joint resolution, amendment, motion, or conference report if the enactment of the bill or resolution as reported in the House or enactment of the bill or resolution in the Senate, the adoption and enactment of an amendment, or the enactment of a bill or resolution in the form recommended in the conference report would cause the surplus for any fiscal year covered by the most recently agreed to budget resolution to be less than the surplus of the Federal Hospital Insurance Trust Fund for such year. Makes such point of order inapplicable to social security or Medicare reform legislation. Excludes changes in outlays or receipts resulting from social security or Medicare reform legislation in calculating the surplus for any fiscal year for purposes of enforcing the previous point of order. Establishes the levels of surplus for purposes of enforcing the preceding points of order.

Requires any Federal budget submitted by the President that recommends an on-budget surplus for any fiscal year that is less than the surplus of the Federal Hospital Insurance Trust Fund for such year to include proposed legislative language for social security or Medicare reform legislation. Makes the lock-box requirements of H. Con. Res. 290 (106th Congress), as amended by this Act, and the preceding paragraph inapplicable upon the enactment of social security and Medicare reform legislation. Defines "social security reform legislation" and "Medicare reform legislation" as a bill or joint resolution to save social security or Medicare, respectively, that specifies that it constitutes reform legislation for purposes of such resolution.

(Sec. 202) Requires any official Federal Government statement of the Federal or congressional budget surplus or deficit totals to exclude the outlays and receipts of the Old-Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance Program under the Social Security Act. Requires such outlays and receipts to be submitted in separate social security budget documents.