Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/18/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/18/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/18/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/18/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/18/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/18/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/18/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/18/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/18/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/18/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/19/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/19/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/19/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/19/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/19/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/19/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/21/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/21/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/21/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/21/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/21/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/21/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/21/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/21/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/21/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/21/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/25/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/25/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/25/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/25/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/25/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/25/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/25/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/25/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/26/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/26/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/26/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/26/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/26/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/26/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/27/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/27/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/27/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/27/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/27/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/27/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/27/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/28/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/28/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/28/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/28/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/28/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 09/28/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/28/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/28/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/28/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/28/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/28/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/28/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/28/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/28/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/28/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/28/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/28/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/28/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/28/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/28/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/02/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/02/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/02/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 10/02/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/02/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/02/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/02/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/02/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/02/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/02/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/02/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/02/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/02/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/03/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/03/2000