Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/19/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/19/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/19/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/20/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/20/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/25/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/02/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/02/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/02/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/03/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 10/03/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 10/03/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/04/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/05/2000