There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Essential Rural Hospital Preservation Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to preserve essential rural hospitals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/20/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
10/20/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
09/29/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/20/2000Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
09/20/2000Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
09/20/2000Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/20/2000Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1536-1537)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/20/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/20/2000 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health09/29/2000 Referred to
House Commerce09/20/2000 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment10/20/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5220.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5220. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/20/2000)

Essential Rural Hospital Preservation Act of 2000 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to revise the Medicare program with regard to essential rural hospitals by: (1) treating as allowable costs 100 percent of bad debts attributable to uncollectible copayments and deductions; (2) exempting such hospitals from the hospital outpatient prospective payment system; and (3) providing for disproportionate share hospital (DSH) payments (with a minimum DSH adjustment percentage of 20 percent) for essential rural hospital discharges between May 1, 1986, and October 1, 1997.