Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 09/20/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/20/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/28/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/28/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/28/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/28/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/02/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/02/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/02/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/02/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/04/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/11/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/11/2000