Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 09/20/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/20/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 09/20/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/20/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/21/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/28/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/04/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/16/2000