Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/03/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/10/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/10/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/10/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/10/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/10/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/10/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/10/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/10/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/21/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/21/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/21/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/21/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/21/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/21/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/21/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/30/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/30/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/30/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/27/2000