Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/27/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/27/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/27/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/27/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/27/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/28/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/03/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/06/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/11/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/18/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 10/19/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/26/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/15/2000