Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 09/22/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 09/22/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/03/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/03/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/03/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/03/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/05/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/05/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/05/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/05/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/05/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/05/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/05/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/05/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 10/05/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/05/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/19/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/19/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/19/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/19/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/19/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/19/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/19/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/19/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/19/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/19/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 10/19/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/23/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/24/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/24/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/24/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/15/2000