Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/25/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/25/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/25/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/27/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/27/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/27/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/27/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/27/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/27/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/28/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/28/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/28/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/28/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/28/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 09/28/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/28/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/28/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/28/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/02/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/02/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/02/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/02/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/02/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/02/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/02/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/02/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/02/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/02/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/02/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/02/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/02/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/06/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/06/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/06/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/06/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/11/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/11/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/11/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/11/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/26/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/26/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/26/2000