Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 09/26/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 09/26/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/03/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/03/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/03/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/03/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/11/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/11/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/11/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/12/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/12/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/12/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 10/19/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/19/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/19/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/23/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/07/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/07/2000