Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/06/2000 Became Public Law No: 106-446.
11/06/2000 Signed by President.
10/28/2000 Presented to President.
10/26/2000 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H11302-11303; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H11302-11303)
10/24/2000 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/10/2000 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9599)
09/27/2000 Introduced in House