There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the immediate termination of the Department of Defense practice of euthanizing military working dogs at the end of their useful working life and to facilitate the adoption of retired military working dogs by law enforcement agencies, former handlers of these dogs, and other persons capable of caring for these dogs.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
11/06/2000Became Public Law No: 106-446. (TXT | PDF)
11/06/2000Signed by President.
10/28/2000Presented to President.
10/26/2000Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H11302-11303; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H11302-11303)
10/24/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/10/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9599)
09/27/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/06/2000Became Public Law No: 106-446. (TXT | PDF)
11/06/2000Signed by President.
10/28/2000HousePresented to President.
10/26/2000-8:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/26/2000-8:04pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H11302-11303; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H11302-11303)
10/26/2000-8:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion.
10/26/2000-7:59pmHouseMr. Bartlett moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
10/25/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/24/2000SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/24/2000SenateS.Amdt.4338 Amendment SA 4338 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/24/2000SenateS.Amdt.4338 Amendment SA 4338 proposed by Senator Smith NH for Senator Robb. (consideration: CR S10942-10943; text: CR S10942) To provide a substitute.
10/24/2000SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10942-10943)
10/11/2000SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/10/2000-9:56pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/10/2000-9:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/10/2000-9:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9599)
10/10/2000-9:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5314.
10/10/2000-9:47pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9599-9601)
10/10/2000-9:46pmHouseMr. Bartlett moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/27/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
09/27/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/06/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/06/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/06/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/06/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/06/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/06/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/06/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/06/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/06/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/06/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/06/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/06/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/06/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/06/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/06/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/06/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/06/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/06/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/06/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/06/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/06/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/06/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Armed Services09/27/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5314.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5314. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/24/2000)

Authorizes the Secretary of Defense to make a military working dog available for adoption by law enforcement agencies, former handlers, and other persons capable of humanely caring for such dogs at the end of such dog's useful working life or when the dog is otherwise excess to the needs of the Department of Defense. Requires the commander of the last unit to which the dog is assigned to make the decision whether a particular dog is suitable or unsuitable for adoption. Holds harmless the United States from: (1) any damages or injury caused by a dog after such transfer; or (2) any veterinary expense associated with a medical condition of a working dog before the transfer, whether or not such condition is known at the time.

Requires an annual report from the Secretary to Congress concerning dogs adopted, waiting for adoption, or euthanized during the preceding year (with an explanation in the case of euthanization).