There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Frederick Douglass Gardens, Inc., to establish a memorial and gardens on Department of the Interior lands in the District of Columbia or its environs in honor and commemoration of Frederick Douglass.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
11/09/2000Became Public Law No: 106-479. (TXT | PDF)
11/09/2000Signed by President.
10/28/2000Presented to President.
10/26/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11180)
10/03/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8717)
09/28/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/09/2000Became Public Law No: 106-479. (TXT | PDF)
11/09/2000Signed by President.
10/28/2000HousePresented to President.
10/27/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/26/2000SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11180)
10/04/2000SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/03/2000-8:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/03/2000-8:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8717)
10/03/2000-8:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5331.
10/03/2000-8:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8717-8720)
10/03/2000-8:00pmHouseMr. Hansen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/02/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
09/28/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
09/28/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/28/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/28/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/28/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/28/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 09/28/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/02/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/02/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/02/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/02/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/02/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/03/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources09/28/2000 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands10/02/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5331.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5331. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/28/2000)

Authorizes Frederick Douglass Gardens, Inc., to establish a memorial and gardens on Department of the Interior lands in the District of Columbia or its environs in honor and commemoration of Frederick Douglass.