Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/03/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/09/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/25/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/02/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/04/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/17/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/12/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/04/1999