There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

McKinney-Vento Homeless Assistance Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

McKinney-Vento Homeless Assistance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To rename the Stewart B. McKinney Homeless Assistance Act as the "McKinney-Vento Homeless Assistance Act".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/30/2000Became Public Law No: 106-400. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/2000Signed by President.
10/19/2000Presented to President.
10/13/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10545)
10/11/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.(text: CR H9796)
10/11/2000Committee on Banking and Financial Services discharged.
10/06/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/30/2000Became Public Law No: 106-400. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/2000Signed by President.
10/19/2000HousePresented to President.
10/13/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/13/2000SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10545)
10/11/2000-7:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/11/2000-7:04pmHouseOn passage Passed by voice vote. (text: CR H9796)
10/11/2000-7:04pmHouseThe previous question was ordered without objection.
10/11/2000-6:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5417.
10/11/2000-6:28pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9796-9800)
10/11/2000-6:28pmHouseMr. Leach asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
10/11/2000HouseCommittee on Banking and Financial Services discharged.
10/06/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Banking and Financial Services.
10/06/2000HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1712)
10/06/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/06/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 10/06/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/06/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 10/06/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/10/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/10/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/10/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/10/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/10/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/10/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/10/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/10/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/10/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/10/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/10/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/10/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 10/10/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/10/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/10/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/10/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/10/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/10/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/10/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/10/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/10/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/11/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/11/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/11/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/11/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/11/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking and Financial Services10/06/2000 Referred to
10/11/2000 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5417.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5417. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/06/2000)

Renames the Stewart B.McKinney Homeless Assistance Act as the McKinney-Vento Homeless Assistance Act.