Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/12/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/12/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/16/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/16/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/16/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/17/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/23/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/23/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/24/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/31/2000