Summary: H.R.5538 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for H.R.5538. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/25/2000)

Minimum Wage Act of 2000 - Amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to increase the Federal minimum wage (currently $5.15 per hour) to: (1) $5.65 an hour during the year beginning on January 1, 2001; and (2) $6.15 an hour beginning on January 1, 2002.

(This bill also states that the current $5.15 Federal minimum wage is, or was, in effect during the period ending June 30, 2000, but does not indicate what amount or coverage is, or is to be, in effect from the period from July 1 through December 31, 2000.)