Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 11/01/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 11/01/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/01/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/01/2000
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 11/02/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/02/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/02/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/02/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/02/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 11/02/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/02/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/02/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/02/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/02/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/02/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/02/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/02/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/02/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/02/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/02/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/02/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/02/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/02/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/02/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/02/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 11/02/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/02/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/02/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/02/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/02/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/02/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/02/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/02/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/03/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/03/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/03/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/03/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/13/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/13/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/13/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/13/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/13/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/13/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/13/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/13/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/13/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/13/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/13/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/13/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/14/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/14/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 11/14/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/04/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 12/04/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/04/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/04/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 12/04/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/04/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 12/04/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/04/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 12/04/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/04/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/04/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 12/04/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 12/04/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/04/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/04/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/04/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/04/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/07/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/07/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 12/07/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/07/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 12/07/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 12/14/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/14/2000