There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Armed Services Vote Rescue Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit a State from determining that a ballot submitted by an absent uniformed services voter was improperly or fraudulently cast unless the State finds clear and convincing evidence of fraud, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/06/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/06/2000Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/2000Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2136-2138)
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/06/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/06/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 12/06/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 12/06/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 12/07/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 12/07/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 12/07/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/07/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 12/07/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 12/07/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/08/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 12/08/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 12/11/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 12/11/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 12/11/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/11/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/13/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/13/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 12/13/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 12/14/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/14/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/15/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/15/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration12/06/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5642.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5642. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/06/2000)

Armed Services Vote Rescue Act - Prohibits a State from refusing to count a ballot submitted in a Federal election by an absent uniformed services voter on the grounds that the ballot was improperly or fraudulently cast, unless the State finds clear and convincing evidence of fraud in the preparation or casting of the ballot by the voter.