Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/06/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/06/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 12/06/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 12/06/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 12/06/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 12/07/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 12/07/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 12/07/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/07/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 12/07/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 12/07/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/08/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 12/08/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 12/11/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 12/11/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 12/11/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/11/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/13/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/13/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 12/13/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 12/14/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/14/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/15/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/15/2000