Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/03/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/03/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/03/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/09/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/09/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/09/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/24/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/03/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/03/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/03/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/09/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/09/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 03/09/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/09/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/09/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/16/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/23/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/13/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/11/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/09/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/09/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/16/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/29/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/13/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 08/03/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/08/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/08/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/04/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/12/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/12/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/18/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/18/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/21/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/28/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/14/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/21/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/21/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/11/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/13/2000