Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/25/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/21/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/21/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/27/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/02/2000