Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/10/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/04/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/10/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/24/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/12/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/13/1999