Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/23/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/23/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/02/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/02/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/13/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/13/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/13/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/13/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/13/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/04/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/13/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/13/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/13/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/13/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/13/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/25/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/25/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/08/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/08/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/08/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/15/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/21/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/03/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/08/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/08/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/08/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/21/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/24/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/28/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/28/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/19/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/04/2000