Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/23/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/18/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/18/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/15/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/13/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/15/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/15/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/20/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/30/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/23/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/23/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/23/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/01/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/01/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/18/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/31/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/14/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/13/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/02/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/16/2000