Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/08/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/08/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/08/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 02/08/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/10/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/10/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/10/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/10/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/10/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/10/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/10/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/23/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/23/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/23/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/23/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/23/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/04/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/18/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/18/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/24/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/14/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/14/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/14/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/06/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/07/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/17/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/24/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/26/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/29/2000