Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/09/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/09/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/23/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/15/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/15/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/15/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/15/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/15/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/15/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/15/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/15/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/15/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/15/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/15/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/15/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/15/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/17/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/17/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/14/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/29/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/29/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/29/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/29/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/29/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/29/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/29/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/29/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/29/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/29/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/29/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/29/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/06/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/06/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/19/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/19/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/14/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/14/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/14/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 10/18/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/10/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/01/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/22/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/22/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/22/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/22/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/29/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/29/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/03/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/06/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/10/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/13/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/03/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/03/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/09/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/09/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/09/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/16/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/18/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/22/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/24/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/06/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/06/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/12/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/12/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/12/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/22/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/22/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/17/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/25/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/25/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/27/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/03/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/12/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew