Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/01/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/01/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/01/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/08/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/08/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/08/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/08/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/08/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/08/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/08/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/15/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/22/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/22/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/22/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/19/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/19/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/19/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/19/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/03/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/03/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/03/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/10/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/27/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/27/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/14/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/14/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/14/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/14/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/22/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/25/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/25/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/25/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/01/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/12/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/13/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/13/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/19/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/30/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/30/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/14/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/24/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/28/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/06/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/14/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/14/2000