Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/09/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/23/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/04/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/04/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/04/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/18/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/29/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/24/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/09/1999