Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/09/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/04/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/09/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/28/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/28/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/28/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/29/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/29/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/06/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/06/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/06/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/18/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/18/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/09/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/09/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/09/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/20/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/20/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/20/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/04/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/21/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/23/2000