Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/11/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/09/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/09/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/24/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/24/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/14/1999