Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/13/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/13/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/20/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/28/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/29/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/04/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/11/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/26/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/07/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/13/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/15/1999