Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/13/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/13/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/13/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/13/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/24/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/24/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/24/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/24/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/10/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/10/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/10/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/24/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/18/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/15/1999