Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/04/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/04/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/04/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/04/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/04/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/04/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/04/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/04/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/04/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/04/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/04/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/04/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/18/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/18/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/18/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/12/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/12/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/12/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/12/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/05/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/05/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/05/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/05/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/05/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/07/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/07/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/07/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 02/01/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/23/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/17/2000