Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/19/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/19/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/19/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 01/19/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 01/19/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/19/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 01/19/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 01/19/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/19/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 01/19/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/19/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/19/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/19/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/19/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 01/19/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/19/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/19/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/19/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/19/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/19/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 01/19/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 01/19/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/19/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/19/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/19/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/19/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 01/19/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/19/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 01/19/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/19/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/19/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/19/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/02/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 02/02/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/02/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/02/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/02/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/02/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/02/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/02/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/02/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/02/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/02/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/02/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/04/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/04/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/04/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/04/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/04/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/04/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/04/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/04/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/04/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/09/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/09/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/09/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/09/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/09/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/11/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 02/11/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/11/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/11/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/11/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/11/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/11/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/25/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/25/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/25/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/25/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/25/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/04/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/11/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/16/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/16/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/16/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/18/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/18/1999