Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/11/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/01/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/01/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 03/01/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/01/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/01/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/01/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/01/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/01/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/01/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/01/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/01/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/01/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/01/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/01/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/01/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/01/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/01/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/01/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/01/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/01/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/01/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/01/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/01/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/01/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/01/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/01/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/01/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/01/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/01/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/04/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/04/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/04/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/04/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/04/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/04/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/04/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/11/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/11/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/25/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/25/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/25/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/15/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/15/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/15/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/15/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/15/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/15/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/15/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/15/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/15/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/15/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/15/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/15/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/26/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/26/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/26/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/26/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/26/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/26/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/26/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/26/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/26/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 04/26/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/06/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/06/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/06/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/06/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/06/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/06/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/14/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/14/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/14/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/14/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/14/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/14/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/14/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/14/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/07/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/14/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/14/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/14/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/14/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/29/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/01/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/19/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/19/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/19/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/19/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/19/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 08/05/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 08/05/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/15/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/15/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/15/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/24/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/14/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/28/2000