Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/09/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/09/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/11/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/11/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/25/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/25/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/25/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/04/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/16/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/12/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/15/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/15/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/15/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/21/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/21/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/21/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/21/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/21/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/21/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/03/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/06/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/06/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/07/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/07/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/10/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/29/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/20/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 08/05/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/09/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/09/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/09/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/23/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/24/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/07/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/21/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/21/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/18/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/02/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/02/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/02/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/10/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/01/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/01/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/09/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/30/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/12/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/06/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew