Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/25/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/25/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/15/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/15/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/15/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/15/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/20/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/22/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/22/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/22/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/29/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/05/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/05/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/06/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/13/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/13/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/25/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/27/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/08/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/10/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/18/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/22/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/23/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/29/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/29/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/01/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/01/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/13/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/15/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/15/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/16/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/16/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/16/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/21/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/21/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/21/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/27/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/29/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 07/29/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/05/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/08/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/14/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/14/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/21/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/21/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/21/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/28/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/30/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/07/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/14/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 10/19/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/19/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/20/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/21/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/26/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/28/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/02/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/02/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/04/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/05/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/05/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 11/09/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/16/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/17/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/17/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/17/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 01/31/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/01/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/02/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/10/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/10/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/16/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/14/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/15/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/04/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/04/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/10/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/25/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/25/2000