Committees: H.R.728 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/11/1999 Referred to
10/27/1999 Markup by
04/04/2000 Reported by House Report 106-484,Part 2
House Agriculture Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities, Resource Conservation and Credit02/22/1999 Referred to
04/15/1999 Hearings by
07/20/1999 Markup by
07/20/1999 Reported by
House Resources02/11/1999 Referred to
04/04/2000 Discharged from
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power02/22/1999 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/11/1999 Referred to
11/18/1999 Reported by House Report 106-484,Part 1
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment02/12/1999 Referred to
09/24/1999 Hearings by
11/10/1999 Markup by
11/10/1999 Reported by