Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/18/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/25/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/20/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/25/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/25/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/25/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/25/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/09/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/09/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/09/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/09/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/09/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/09/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/09/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/09/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/09/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/16/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/16/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/01/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/30/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/30/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 08/02/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/17/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/01/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/05/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/18/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/21/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 11/04/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/04/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 11/04/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/08/2000
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/08/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/23/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/23/2000