Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/01/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/01/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/01/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/01/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/01/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/04/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/04/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/17/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/17/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/28/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/11/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/11/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/11/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/11/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/11/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/19/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/19/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/18/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/18/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/18/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/18/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/18/1999
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/18/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/01/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/16/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/14/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/19/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/26/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 01/31/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 01/31/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/29/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/01/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/08/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/30/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/09/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/19/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/25/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/18/2000