Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 02/11/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/11/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/23/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/23/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/23/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 02/23/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/23/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/23/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/23/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/23/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/23/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/23/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/23/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/23/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/23/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/24/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/24/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/24/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/03/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/03/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/03/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/03/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/03/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/03/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/03/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/03/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/03/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/11/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/11/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/11/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/11/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/16/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/16/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/16/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/24/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/24/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/24/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/24/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/24/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/24/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/24/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/24/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/13/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/13/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/13/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/13/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/13/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/13/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/13/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/21/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/21/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/21/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/21/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/21/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/21/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/21/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/21/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/28/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/28/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/28/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/05/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/05/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/05/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/05/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/06/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/11/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/11/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/18/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/18/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/18/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/26/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/17/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/17/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/30/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/30/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/22/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/22/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/22/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/22/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/22/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/27/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/27/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/04/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/04/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/17/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew