Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 02/12/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/12/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/12/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/12/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/16/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/16/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/16/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/16/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/16/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/16/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/16/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/16/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/16/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/16/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/29/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/29/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/29/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/29/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/29/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/29/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/29/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/29/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/12/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/12/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/12/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/12/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/20/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/20/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/20/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/20/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/20/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/20/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/20/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/20/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/20/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/20/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/20/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/20/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/20/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/18/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/18/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/18/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/29/1999