Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/12/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/12/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/24/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/24/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/24/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/24/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/13/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/20/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/28/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/28/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/28/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/05/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/05/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/05/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/05/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/05/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/05/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/13/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/08/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/08/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/24/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/30/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/30/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/30/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/01/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/20/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/20/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/20/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/20/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/08/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/08/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/14/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/14/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/14/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/27/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/27/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/19/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/19/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/19/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/19/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/19/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/01/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/01/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/01/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/16/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/13/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/20/2000