Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/24/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/24/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/24/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/24/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/24/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/24/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/24/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/24/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/24/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 02/24/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/24/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/24/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/24/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/24/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 02/24/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/24/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/10/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/10/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/25/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/25/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/25/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/25/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/25/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/25/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/13/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/13/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/14/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/14/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/22/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/22/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/22/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/22/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/22/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/22/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/22/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/22/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/27/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/29/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/03/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/04/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/05/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/06/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/06/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/10/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/10/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/10/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/11/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/11/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/11/1999