Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/24/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/03/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/03/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/03/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/03/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/10/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/10/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/10/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/10/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/10/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/16/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/16/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/23/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/23/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/12/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/12/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/20/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/20/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/20/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/20/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/04/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/04/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/06/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/06/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/18/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/18/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/18/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/18/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/26/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/26/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/27/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/08/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/08/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/08/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/08/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/15/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/15/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/18/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/18/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/18/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/18/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/18/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/18/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/24/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/29/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/29/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/12/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/12/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/15/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/15/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/21/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/21/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/21/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/21/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/22/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/27/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 08/03/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 08/04/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 08/04/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/09/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/09/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/13/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/13/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/15/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/21/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/24/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/24/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/29/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/29/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/29/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/05/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/05/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/05/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/05/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/12/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/12/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/19/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/19/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/28/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/03/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 11/03/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/09/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/09/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 11/09/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/27/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/02/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/29/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/29/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/01/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/28/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/11/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/13/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/02/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/15/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/19/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/25/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/21/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/22/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/27/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/27/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/17/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/19/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/25/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/02/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/05/2000