Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/10/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/16/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/16/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/23/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/23/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/23/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/23/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/23/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/23/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/23/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/23/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/23/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/23/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/23/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/23/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/23/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/23/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/23/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/23/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/25/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 03/25/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/25/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/12/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/20/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/20/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/20/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/28/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/28/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/28/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/28/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/04/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/04/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/04/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/06/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/11/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/11/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/18/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/18/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/26/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/26/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/26/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/27/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/27/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/27/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/27/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/27/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/27/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/08/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/08/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/09/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/09/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/18/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/18/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/18/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/18/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/18/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/22/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/22/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/23/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/12/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/12/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/15/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/15/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/15/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/15/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/21/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/22/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/03/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/03/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/09/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/09/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/24/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/05/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/05/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/19/1999